VA HB882 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0667)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0667)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Stormwater management; proprietary best management practices. Directs the State Water Control Board to adopt regulations providing for the use of a proprietary best management practice (BMP) only if another state, regional, or national certification program has verified and certified its nutrient or sediment removal effectiveness. The bill requires any proprietary BMP that is included on the Virginia Stormwater BMP Clearinghouse website prior to July 1, 2020, to provide documentation to the Department of Environmental Quality showing that its effectiveness has been verified by another state, regional, or national certification program and prohibits any such proprietary BMP that fails to provide such documentation from being used in any stormwater management plan submitted on or after January 1, 2022.
Title
Stormwater management; use of a proprietary best management practice.
Sponsors
Del. David Bulova [D] | Del. Kaye Kory [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-25 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House: VOTE: (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House: VOTE: (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-06 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0667) | |
2020-04-06 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 667 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-12 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-12 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020 |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-02 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-02 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB882ER) |
2020-03-02 | House | Enrolled |
2020-02-25 | House | VOTE: Adoption (97-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-25 | House | Senate substitute agreed to by House 20108441D-S1 (97-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-25 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (38-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB882S1 |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 20108441D-S1 |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (15-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-01-28 | House | VOTE: (97-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-28 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-27 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB882H1 |
2020-01-27 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 20106106D-H1 |
2020-01-27 | House | Read second time |
2020-01-24 | House | Read first time |
2020-01-22 | House | Committee substitute printed 20106106D-H1 |
2020-01-22 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-20 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-14 | House | Assigned ACNR sub: Chesapeake |
2020-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2020-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20105081D |