VA HB881 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1217)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1217)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Illegal gambling; skill games; exception. Includes the playing or offering for play of any skill game in the definition of "illegal gambling." The bill also includes skill games within the definition of "gambling devices." The bill defines a "skill game" as an electronic, computerized, or mechanical contrivance, terminal, machine, or other device that requires the insertion of a coin, currency, ticket, token, or similar object to operate, activate, or play a game, the outcome of which is determined by any element of skill of the player and that may deliver or entitle the person playing or operating the device to receive cash; cash equivalents, gift cards, vouchers, billets, tickets, tokens, or electronic credits to be exchanged for cash; merchandise; or anything of value whether the payoff is made automatically from the device or manually. The bill exempts family entertainment centers from the prohibition against the playing or offering of any skill game, provided the prize won or distributed to a player by the skill games offered by such centers is a noncash, merchandise prize or a voucher, billet, ticket, token, or electronic credit redeemable only for a noncash, merchandise prize that also meets certain other requirements.
Title
Illegal gambling; definitions, skill games.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-04-22 - House - House: VOTE: (77-Y 17-N 1-A) (Y: 77 N: 17 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (34-Y 6-N) (Y: 34 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Amendments specific and severable (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (22-Y 18-N) (Y: 22 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (90-Y 1-N 2-A) (Y: 90 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (0-Y 91-N 1-A) (Y: 0 N: 91 NV: 8 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (28-Y 12-N) (Y: 28 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (7-Y 5-N) (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (80-Y 15-N) (Y: 80 N: 15 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (20-Y 1-N) (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (20-Y 1-N) (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (34-Y 6-N) (Y: 34 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Amendments specific and severable (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (22-Y 18-N) (Y: 22 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (90-Y 1-N 2-A) (Y: 90 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (0-Y 91-N 1-A) (Y: 0 N: 91 NV: 8 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (28-Y 12-N) (Y: 28 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (7-Y 5-N) (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (80-Y 15-N) (Y: 80 N: 15 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (20-Y 1-N) (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (20-Y 1-N) (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-22 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1217) | |
2020-04-22 | House | Enacted, Chapter 1217 (effective - see bill) |
2020-04-22 | Senate | Signed by President as reenrolled |
2020-04-22 | House | Signed by Speaker as reenrolled |
2020-04-22 | House | Reenrolled bill text (HB881ER2) |
2020-04-22 | House | Reenrolled |
2020-04-22 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2020-04-22 | Senate | Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (34-Y 6-N) |
2020-04-22 | Senate | Amendments specific and severable (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-04-22 | House | VOTE: (77-Y 17-N 1-A) |
2020-04-22 | House | House concurred in Governor's recommendation (77-Y 17-N 1-A) |
2020-04-22 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-04-11 | House | Governor's substitute printed 20110202D-H1 |
2020-04-11 | House | Governor's recommendation received by House |
2020-03-20 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-20 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 20, 2020 |
2020-03-19 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-18 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB881ER) |
2020-03-18 | House | Enrolled |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (22-Y 18-N) |
2020-03-05 | House | VOTE: Adoption (90-Y 1-N 2-A) |
2020-03-05 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (90-Y 1-N 2-A) |
2020-03-05 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Senators: Howell, McPike, Norment |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2020-02-27 | House | Delegates: Bulova, Carr, Knight |
2020-02-27 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2020-02-27 | House | House acceded to request |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Senate requested conference committee |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Senate insisted on amendments (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-26 | House | VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 91-N 1-A) |
2020-02-26 | House | Senate amendment rejected by House (0-Y 91-N 1-A) |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendment (28-Y 12-N) |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (12-Y 3-N) |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (7-Y 5-N) |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Assigned GL&T sub: Gaming |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-02-05 | House | VOTE: Passage (80-Y 15-N) |
2020-02-05 | House | Read third time and passed House (80-Y 15-N) |
2020-02-04 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2020-02-03 | House | Read first time |
2020-01-30 | House | Reported from General Laws (20-Y 1-N) |
2020-01-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-17 | House | Assigned GL sub: ABC/Gaming |
2020-01-15 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2020-01-15 | House | Referred from Courts of Justice by voice vote |
2020-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2020-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20104783D |
Same As/Similar To
SB971 (Same As) 2020-04-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1277)