VA HB863 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Retirement System; health insurance credits for retired state employees. Increases annually the amount of the health insurance credit for retirees who rendered at least 30 years of creditable service in the Virginia Retirement System. The bill increases the credit by the same percentage as any annual post-retirement supplement that is calculated for employees hired on or after July 1, 2010.
Title
Virginia Retirement System; health insurance credits for retired state employees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-08 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (4-Y 3-N) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2018-02-08 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (4-Y 3-N) |
2018-01-19 | House | Assigned App. sub: Compensation & Retirement |
2018-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2018-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18103849D |