VA HB857 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-04 - Incorporated by Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-04 - Incorporated by Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Lobbyist disclosure; definition of gift; technical amendment. Clarifies that gifts to certain members of an individual's family are not considered gifts. Currently, the definition of gift says that gifts from certain members of an individual's family are not considered gifts.
Title
Lobbyist disclosure; clarifies definition of gift.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Incorporated by Rules (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-05 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-05 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-04 | Senate | Incorporated by Rules |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2016-02-16 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-16 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-15 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2016-02-12 | House | Read first time |
2016-02-10 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-05 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-19 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Ethics |
2016-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2016-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16102553D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1362 (Similar To) 2016-05-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0773)