VA HB853 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0697)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0697)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Policies addressing suicidal students. Removes repetitive language permitting universities to establish policies regarding students who are a danger to themselves or others; this section and another on violence prevention already permit such policies.
Title
Suicidal students; higher educational institutions shall develop policies addressing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-05 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-09 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-06 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-09 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-06 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-09 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0697) | |
2012-04-09 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 697 (effective 7/1/12) | |
2012-03-09 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2012-03-08 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2012-03-08 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB853ER) | |
2012-03-08 | House: Enrolled | |
2012-03-05 | House: VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N) | |
2012-03-05 | House: Senate amendment agreed to by House (96-Y 0-N) | |
2012-03-02 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2012-03-01 | Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (39-Y 0-N) | |
2012-03-01 | Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) | |
2012-03-01 | Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-03-01 | Senate: Amendment by Senator Barker agreed to | |
2012-03-01 | Senate: Reading of amendment waived | |
2012-03-01 | Senate: Committee amendment rejected | |
2012-03-01 | Senate: Reading of amendment waived | |
2012-03-01 | Senate: Read third time | |
2012-02-29 | Senate: Passed by for the day | |
2012-02-29 | Senate: Read third time | |
2012-02-28 | Senate: Passed by for the day | |
2012-02-28 | Senate: Read third time | |
2012-02-27 | Senate: Passed by for the day | |
2012-02-27 | Senate: Read third time | |
2012-02-24 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-23 | Senate: Passed by for the day | |
2012-02-23 | Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (15-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-10 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Education and Health | |
2012-02-10 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2012-02-09 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-09 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-08 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB853H1 | |
2012-02-08 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 12105085D-H1 | |
2012-02-08 | House: Read second time | |
2012-02-07 | House: Read first time | |
2012-02-06 | House: Committee substitute printed 12105085D-H1 | |
2012-02-06 | House: Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-31 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-18 | House: Assigned Education sub: Higher Education and Arts | |
2012-01-11 | House: Referred to Committee on Education | |
2012-01-11 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12102945D |
Same As/Similar To
SB458 (Same As) 2012-04-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0721)