VA HB852 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0211)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0211)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Alcoholic beverage control; substance abuse prevention; Virginia Institutions of Higher Education Substance Use Advisory Committee established. Directs the Board of Directors of the Virginia Alcoholic Beverage Control Authority (Board) to establish and appoint members to the Virginia Institutions of Higher Education Substance Use Advisory Committee (Advisory Committee). The bill provides that the goal of the Advisory Committee shall be to develop and update a statewide strategic plan for substance use education, prevention, and intervention at Virginia's public and private institutions of higher education. The bill provides that the Advisory Committee shall consist of representatives from Virginia's public and private institutions of higher education, including students and directors of student health, and such other members as the Board may deem appropriate. This bill is identical to SB 120.
Title
Virginia Institutions of Higher Education Substance Use Advisory Committee; established.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-09 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0211) | |
2018-03-09 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 211 (effective 7/1/18) | |
2018-03-02 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 9, 2018 | |
2018-03-02 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 2, 2018 |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-02-26 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-02-26 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB852ER) |
2018-02-26 | House | Enrolled |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Read third time |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2018-01-31 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-31 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-30 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2018-01-29 | House | Read first time |
2018-01-25 | House | Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-19 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2018-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2018-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18101329D |