VA HB842 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Removal of public officers; petition requirements; signature requirements. Clarifies that the requirement that a petition for the removal of a public officer be signed under penalty of perjury applies only to the person or persons filing such petition with the circuit court. Registered voters signing the petition for purposes of reaching the required number of signatures shall not be required to sign under penalty of perjury. The bill also increases the required number of signatures to a number of registered voters in the locality equal to 25 percent, up from 10 percent, of the total number of votes cast at the last election for the office, and requires the signatures to be collected within a 60-day period.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Removal of public officers; petition requirements, signature requirements.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (2-Y 3-N) (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-11HouseLeft in Privileges and Elections
2020-01-23HouseSubcommittee failed to recommend reporting (2-Y 3-N)
2020-01-13HouseAssigned P & E sub: Campaign Finance
2020-01-07HouseReferred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
2020-01-07HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20100729D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
242233(n/a)See Bill Text
242235(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback