VA HB835 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-12 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-12 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Residential Property Disclosure Act; underground pipelines. Requires the disclosure that the owner/seller of residential real property makes no representations with respect to the presence of any underground pipelines or storage tanks carrying hazardous material such as natural gas or oil and that purchasers are advised to exercise whatever due diligence they deem necessary to determine the presence of any pipeline that may lie beneath the property, including using the National Pipeline Mapping System's (NPMS) public viewer, in accordance with terms and conditions as may be contained in the real estate purchase contract, but in any event prior to settlement pursuant to that contract.
Title
Virginia Residential Property Disclosure Act; disclosure of underground pipelines or storage tanks.
Sponsors
Del. Mark Keam [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-12 | House | Left in General Laws |
2014-01-14 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2014-01-10 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2014-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2014-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14102456D |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+sum+HB835 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+ful+HB835+hil |