VA HB832 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on March 2 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Department of Professional and Occupational Regulation; registration of athlete agents; penalty; civil penalty. Creates a registration requirement for athlete agents administered by the Director of the Department of Professional and Occupational Regulation, sets out the requirements for registration and conduct of athlete agents, and provides for administrative, civil, and criminal penalties.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Athlete agents; creates registration requirement, penalties.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (34-Y 6-N) (Y: 33 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (12-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (87-Y 12-N) (Y: 86 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 1-N) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-12 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
2020-03-12HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020
2020-03-03SenateSigned by President
2020-03-02HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-03-02HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB832ER)
2020-03-02HouseEnrolled
2020-02-26SenatePassed Senate (34-Y 6-N)
2020-02-26SenateRead third time
2020-02-26SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
2020-02-25SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N)
2020-02-19SenateRereferred to Finance and Appropriations
2020-02-19SenateReported from General Laws and Technology (12-Y 0-N 1-A)
2020-02-12SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2020-02-12SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2020-02-11HouseVOTE: Passage (87-Y 12-N)
2020-02-11HouseRead third time and passed House (87-Y 12-N)
2020-02-10HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB832H1
2020-02-10HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 20107192D-H1
2020-02-10HouseRead second time
2020-02-09HouseRead first time
2020-02-07HouseReported from Appropriations (20-Y 2-N)
2020-02-07HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
2020-02-05HouseAssigned App. sub: Commerce Agriculture & Natural Resources
2020-02-04HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2020-02-04HouseReported from General Laws with substitute (21-Y 1-N)
2020-02-04HouseCommittee substitute printed 20107192D-H1
2020-01-30HouseSubcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
2020-01-30HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 1-N)
2020-01-15HouseAssigned GL sub: Professions/Occupations and Adminstrative Process
2020-01-07HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2020-01-07HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20103022D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
541519(n/a)See Bill Text
541533(n/a)See Bill Text
591200(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+HB832&201+sum+HB832
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB832+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB832H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB832ER+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H1101V0047+HB0832
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H11V0234+HB0832
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H0201V0041+HB0832
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H02V0218+HB0832
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H02V0261+HB0832
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV0849+HB0832
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S12V0196+HB0832
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S05V0449+HB0832
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1050HB0832+HB0832
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1068HB0832+HB0832

Bill Comments

feedback