VA HB83 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Passed on April 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0815)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Feminine hygiene products; no cost to female prisoners or inmates. Directs the State Board of Corrections and the Director of the Department of Corrections to each adopt and implement a standard or procedure to ensure the provision of feminine hygiene products to female prisoners and inmates without charge.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Feminine hygiene products; no cost to female prisoners or inmates.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Governor's recommendation agreed to (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (38-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety with substitute (20-Y 1-N) (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-18 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0815)
2018-04-18HouseEnacted, Chapter 815 (effective 7/1/18)
2018-04-18SenateSigned by President as reenrolled
2018-04-18HouseSigned by Speaker as reenrolled
2018-04-18HouseReenrolled bill text (HB83ER2)
2018-04-18HouseReenrolled
2018-04-18 Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted
2018-04-18SenateSenate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N)
2018-04-18SenateReconsideration of Governor's recommendation agreed to (38-Y 0-N)
2018-04-18SenateSenate concurred in Governor's recommendation (38-Y 0-N 1-A)
2018-04-18HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N)
2018-04-18HouseHouse concurred in Governor's recommendation (96-Y 0-N)
2018-03-29HouseGovernor's recommendation received by House
2018-03-07 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
2018-03-07HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 7, 2018
2018-03-03SenateSigned by President
2018-03-01HouseSigned by Speaker
2018-03-01HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB83ER)
2018-03-01HouseEnrolled
2018-02-27SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2018-02-27SenateRead third time
2018-02-26SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2018-02-23SenateReported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N)
2018-02-14SenateReferred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
2018-02-14SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2018-02-13HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
2018-02-13HouseRead third time and passed House (100-Y 0-N)
2018-02-12HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB83H1
2018-02-12HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 18106353D-H1
2018-02-12HouseRead second time
2018-02-10HouseRead first time
2018-02-09HouseReported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N)
2018-02-08HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
2018-02-02HouseAssigned App. sub: Public Safety
2018-02-02HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2018-02-02HouseCommittee substitute printed 18106353D-H1
2018-02-02HouseReported from Militia, Police and Public Safety with substitute (20-Y 1-N)
2018-02-01HouseSubcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
2018-02-01HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 0-N)
2018-01-15HouseAssigned MPPS sub: Subcommittee #2
2017-12-07HouseReferred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety
2017-12-07HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18101461D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
531131.3(n/a)See Bill Text
53132(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+sum+HB83
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB83+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB83H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB83ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB83ER2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+CHAP0815+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H1502V0030+HB0083
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H15V0013+HB0083
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H0207V0013+HB0083
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H02V0044+HB0083
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV0733+HB0083
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+S09V0089+HB0083
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0720HB0083+HB0083
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0736HB0083+HB0083
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV1631+HB0083
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV1254HB0083+HB0083
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV1255HB0083+HB0083
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV1256HB0083+HB0083

Bill Comments

feedback