VA HB83 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on December 10 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-24 - Tabled in Privileges and Elections by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 10 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-24 - Tabled in Privileges and Elections by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Elections; voting procedures; and voter identification. Provides that an unexpired Virginia driver's license remains valid for purposes of voter identification at the polls notwithstanding the fact that it has been suspended or revoked under certain circumstances.
Title
Voter identification; an unexpired Virginia driver's license remains valid at polls, etc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-24 | House | Tabled in Privileges and Elections by voice vote |
2014-01-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-10 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Elections Subcommittee |
2013-12-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2013-12-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14100941D |