VA HB829 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0147)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0147)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Immunization Information System; linkages to other VDH databases. Allows the Commissioner of Health to allow health care providers authorized to access the Virginia Immunization Information System to also access other information maintained by the Department of Health, including newborn screening records, newborn hearing screening records, and blood-lead level records.
Title
Virginia Immunization Information System; linkages to other VDH databases.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-24 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 1-N) (Y: 101 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-19 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-24 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 1-N) (Y: 101 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-19 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-07 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0147) | |
2012-03-07 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 147 (effective 7/1/12) | |
2012-02-23 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2012-02-23 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2012-02-23 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB829ER) | |
2012-02-23 | House: Enrolled | |
2012-02-20 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-20 | Senate: Read third time | |
2012-02-17 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-16 | Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-25 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Education and Health | |
2012-01-25 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2012-01-24 | House: VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 1-N) | |
2012-01-24 | House: Read third time and passed House (99-Y 1-N) | |
2012-01-23 | House: Read second time and engrossed | |
2012-01-20 | House: Read first time | |
2012-01-19 | House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (21-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-11 | House: Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions | |
2012-01-11 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12101045D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
32 | 1 | 46.01 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
32 | 1 | 46.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
32 | 1 | 64.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
32 | 1 | 64.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
32 | 1 | 65 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
32 | 1 | 67 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
32 | 1 | 67.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |