VA HB828 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0001)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0001)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Dairy Producer Margin Coverage Premium Assistance Program; emergency. Expands eligibility for participation in the Dairy Producer Margin Coverage Premium Assistance Program to include dairy producers who have an approved Natural Resource Conservation Service nutrient management or soil health plan developed by an approved planner. The bill also changes the application deadline from February 1 to May 15 each year and includes an emergency clause.
Title
Dairy Producer Margin Coverage Premium Assistance Program; expands eligibility for participation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-14 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0001) | |
2022-02-14 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 1 (effective 2/14/22) | |
2022-02-07 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., February 14, 2022 | |
2022-02-07 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 7, 2022 |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-02-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-02-07 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB828ER) |
2022-02-07 | House | Enrolled |
2022-02-04 | Senate | Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-04 | Senate | Read third time |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Read second time |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2022-01-25 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-25 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-24 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2022-01-21 | House | Read first time |
2022-01-19 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (21-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2022-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed with emergency clause; offered 01/12/22 22102586D |