VA HB827 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-28 - Passed by indefinitely in Judiciary (9-Y 6-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-28 - Passed by indefinitely in Judiciary (9-Y 6-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Control of firearms by localities. Removes the authority for a locality by ordinance to prohibit the possession or carrying of firearms, ammunition, or components or any combination thereof in (i) any building, or part thereof, owned or used by such locality for governmental purposes; (ii) any public park owned or operated by the locality; (iii) any recreation or community center facility; or (iv) any public street, road, alley, or sidewalk or public right-of-way or any other place of whatever nature that is open to the public and is being used by or is adjacent to a permitted event or an event that would otherwise require a permit. The bill provides that any firearm received by the locality pursuant to a buy-back program shall be offered for sale by public auction or sealed bids to a person licensed as a dealer. Current law provides that any such firearm shall be destroyed by the locality unless the person surrendering the firearm requests in writing that the firearm be offered for sale. The bill also limits the authority of localities and state governmental entities to bring lawsuits against certain firearms manufacturers and others. Control of firearms by localities. Removes the authority for a locality by ordinance to prohibit the possession or carrying of firearms, ammunition, or components or any combination thereof in (i) any building, or part thereof, owned or used by such locality for governmental purposes; (ii) any public park owned or operated by the locality; (iii) any recreation or community center facility; or (iv) any public street, road, alley, or sidewalk or public right-of-way or any other place of whatever nature that is open to the public and is being used by or is adjacent to a permitted event or an event that would otherwise require a permit. The bill provides that any firearm received by the locality pursuant to a buy-back program shall be offered for sale by public auction or sealed bids to a person licensed as a dealer. Current law provides that any such firearm shall be destroyed by the locality unless the person surrendering the firearm requests in writing that the firearm be offered for sale. The bill also limits the authority of localities and state governmental entities to bring lawsuits against certain firearms manufacturers and others.
Title
Firearms; control by localities of possession or carrying.
Sponsors
Del. Tony Wilt [R] | Del. Glenn Davis [R] | Del. John Avoli [R] | Del. Jason Ballard [R] |
Del. Ronnie Campbell [R] | Del. Dave LaRock [R] | Del. Robert Orrock [R] | Del. Margaret Ransone [R] |
Del. Lee Ware [R] | Del. Bill Wiley [R] | Del. Thomas Wright [R] | Del. Scott Wyatt [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Judiciary (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (52-Y 48-N) (Y: 52 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Public Safety (12-Y 10-N) (Y: 12 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 4-N) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (52-Y 48-N) (Y: 52 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Public Safety (12-Y 10-N) (Y: 12 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 4-N) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-28 | Senate | Passed by indefinitely in Judiciary (9-Y 6-N) |
2022-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2022-02-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2022-02-03 | House | VOTE: Passage (52-Y 48-N) |
2022-02-03 | House | Read third time and passed House (52-Y 48-N) |
2022-02-02 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2022-02-01 | House | Read first time |
2022-01-28 | House | Reported from Public Safety (12-Y 10-N) |
2022-01-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 4-N) |
2022-01-26 | House | Assigned PS sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2022-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Public Safety |
2022-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22100614D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 2 | 915 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
15 | 2 | 915.5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
15 | 2 | 915.6 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |