VA HB826 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0841)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0841)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
State plan for medical assistance; perinatal birth workers. Directs the Department of Medical Assistance Services to convene a work group to (i) evaluate the potential costs and benefits, including potential reductions in maternal and infant mortality rates, of amending the state plan for medical assistance services to include a provision for the payment of medical assistance for antepartum, intrapartum, or postpartum services provided to a pregnant person or to a person who is up to one year postpartum for labor and delivery support by a certified doula and at least four visits during the antenatal period and at least seven visits during the postpartum period with a certified doula and (ii) develop recommendations related to an appropriate reimbursement rate for such services provided by certified doulas. The work group shall report its findings and recommendations to the Governor and the Chairmen of the House Committee on Appropriations and the Senate Committee on Finance and Appropriations by December 1, 2020.
Title
State plan for medical assistance; payment for services provided by certified doulas.
Sponsors
Sen. Jennifer Carroll Foy [D] | Del. Dawn Adams [D] | Del. Hala Ayala [D] | Del. Patrick Hope [D] |
Del. Clinton Jenkins [D] | Del. Mark Levine [D] | Del. Sam Rasoul [D] | Del. Ibraheem Samirah [D] |
Del. Marcus Simon [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-07 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0841) | |
2020-04-07 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 841 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-12 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-12 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020 |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-05 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB826ER) |
2020-03-05 | House | Enrolled |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-02-10 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-10 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-07 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB826H1 |
2020-02-07 | House | Committee on Appropriations substitute agreed to 20107706D-H1 |
2020-02-07 | House | Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions amendments rejected |
2020-02-07 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-05 | House | Committee substitute printed 20107706D-H1 |
2020-02-05 | House | Reported from Appropriations with substitute (21-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-05 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-30 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-01-30 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendments (22-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-30 | House | Assigned App. sub: Health & Human Resources |
2020-01-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-01-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-17 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Health |
2020-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2020-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20104932D |