VA HB820 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-28 - VOTE: (48-Y 52-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-28 - VOTE: (48-Y 52-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Small Business and Supplier Diversity; disparity study. Requires the Department of Small Business and Supplier Diversity to conduct a disparity study every five years, next due no later than January 1, 2026. Department of Small Business and Supplier Diversity; disparity study. Requires the Department of Small Business and Supplier Diversity to conduct a disparity study every five years, next due no later than January 1, 2026.
Title
Small Business and Supplier Diversity, Department of; disparity study.
Sponsors
Del. Luke Torian [D] | Del. Jeion Ward [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-28 - House - House: VOTE: (48-Y 52-N) (Y: 48 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-03-11 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (73-Y 22-N 1-A) (Y: 73 N: 22 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (38-Y 2-N) (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on amendment (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - House - House: VOTE: Rejected (1-Y 96-N) (Y: 1 N: 96 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2022-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (36-Y 3-N) (Y: 36 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (77-Y 23-N) (Y: 77 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-11 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (73-Y 22-N 1-A) (Y: 73 N: 22 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (38-Y 2-N) (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on amendment (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - House - House: VOTE: Rejected (1-Y 96-N) (Y: 1 N: 96 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2022-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (36-Y 3-N) (Y: 36 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (77-Y 23-N) (Y: 77 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-28 | House | VOTE: (48-Y 52-N) |
2022-04-27 | House | House sustained Governor's veto (48-Y 52-N) |
2022-04-27 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2022-04-11 | Governor: Vetoed by Governor | |
2022-03-22 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-22 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 22, 2022 |
2022-03-22 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-03-21 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB820ER) |
2022-03-21 | House | Enrolled |
2022-03-11 | House | VOTE: Adoption (73-Y 22-N 1-A) |
2022-03-11 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (73-Y 22-N 1-A) |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (38-Y 2-N) |
2022-03-11 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Senators: Locke, Deeds, Newman |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2022-03-10 | House | Delegates: Torian, Austin, Fowler |
2022-03-10 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2022-03-10 | House | House acceded to request |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Senate requested conference committee |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Senate insisted on amendment (39-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-08 | House | VOTE: Rejected (1-Y 96-N) |
2022-03-08 | House | Senate amendment rejected by House (1-Y 96-N) |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendment (36-Y 3-N) |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Read third time |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (15-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 1-N) |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2022-02-14 | House | VOTE: Passage (77-Y 23-N) |
2022-02-14 | House | Read third time and passed House (77-Y 23-N) |
2022-02-11 | House | Printed as engrossed 22102934D-E |
2022-02-11 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB820E |
2022-02-11 | House | Amendments by Delegate Bloxom agreed to |
2022-02-11 | House | Read second time |
2022-02-10 | House | Passed by for the day |
2022-02-09 | House | Passed by for the day |
2022-02-08 | House | Passed by for the day |
2022-02-07 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-03 | House | Reported from General Laws (21-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-21 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2022-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2022-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22102934D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
2 | 2 | 1605 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 1610 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 4310 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |