VA HB82 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-11-29 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-11-29 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Real property tax; land use valuation. Provides that roll-back taxes shall not apply to real property that loses its designation as devoted to agricultural or horticultural use because of excavation of sand or gravel on it, provided that such property returns to agricultural or horticultural use within two years after commencement of the extraction.
Title
Real property tax; roll-back taxes shall not apply to property that loses its designation, etc.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-11-29 | House | Left in Finance |
2012-01-30 | House | Continued to 2013 in Finance by voice vote |
2012-01-25 | House | Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2013 by voice vote |
2012-01-12 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2011-12-21 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2011-12-21 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12100499D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+sum+HB82 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+ful+HB82+hil |