VA HB819 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-16 - House: Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-16 - House: Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Business entities; process. Provides that "process," when referring to service of process on the registered agent of a corporation, limited liability company, or business trust, includes any subpoena, summons, order, or other notice requiring the appearance of a witness or production of documents that is issued in any civil or criminal proceeding.
Title
Business entities; when referring to service of process includes any subpoena, summons, etc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-16 | House: Left in Courts of Justice | |
2010-02-08 | House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely by voice vote | |
2010-01-25 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (10-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-19 | House: Assigned Courts sub: #1 Criminal | |
2010-01-13 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2010-01-13 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10100957D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
13 | 1 | 1002 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
13 | 1 | 1201 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
13 | 1 | 603 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
13 | 1 | 803 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |