VA HB818 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 20 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0748)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Virginia Freedom of Information Act (FOIA); designation of FOIA officer; posting of FOIA rights and responsibilities. Requires certain local public bodies to post a FOIA rights and responsibilities document on their respective public government website. The bill also requires all state public bodies, including state authorities, and all local public bodies that are subject to FOIA to designate and publicly identify one or more FOIA officers whose responsibility is to serve as a point of contact for members of the public in requesting public records and to coordinate the public body's compliance with the provisions of FOIA. The bill sets out where contact information for the designated FOIA officer is to be posted. The bill requires that any such FOIA officer shall possess specific knowledge of the provisions of FOIA and be trained at least annually by legal counsel for the public body or the Virginia Freedom of Information Advisory Council.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Virginia Freedom of Information Act; designation of officer, posting of rights and responsibilities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-04-20 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (24-Y 15-N) (Y: 24 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Governor's recommendation agreed to (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (23-Y 16-N) (Y: 23 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-02 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendments (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-04-20 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0748)
2016-04-20HouseEnacted, Chapter 748 (effective 7/1/16)
2016-04-20SenateSigned by President as reenrolled
2016-04-20HouseSigned by Speaker as reenrolled
2016-04-20HouseReenrolled bill text (HB818ER2)
2016-04-20HouseReenrolled
2016-04-20 Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted
2016-04-20SenateSenate concurred in Governor's recommendation (24-Y 15-N)
2016-04-20SenateReconsideration of Governor's recommendation agreed to (39-Y 0-N)
2016-04-20SenateSenate concurred in Governor's recommendation (23-Y 16-N)
2016-04-20HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
2016-04-20HouseHouse concurred in Governor's recommendation (97-Y 0-N)
2016-04-20HousePlaced on Calendar
2016-04-01HouseGovernor's recommendation received by House
2016-03-09 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, April 10, 2016
2016-03-09HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/9/2016
2016-03-09SenateSigned by President
2016-03-07HouseSigned by Speaker
2016-03-07HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB818ER)
2016-03-07HouseEnrolled
2016-03-03SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2016-03-03SenateReconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (36-Y 0-N)
2016-03-03SenatePassed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2016-03-03SenateRead third time
2016-03-02SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2016-02-29SenateReported from General Laws and Technology (12-Y 0-N)
2016-02-09SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2016-02-09SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2016-02-08HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
2016-02-08HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
2016-02-05HousePrinted as engrossed 16103655D-E
2016-02-05HouseEngrossed by House as amended HB818E
2016-02-05HouseCommittee amendments agreed to
2016-02-05HouseRead second time
2016-02-04HouseRead first time
2016-02-02HouseReported from General Laws with amendments (21-Y 0-N)
2016-01-28HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N)
2016-01-18HouseAssigned GL sub: Subcommittee #2
2016-01-12HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2016-01-12HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16103655D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
223704.1(n/a)See Bill Text
223704.2(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+sum+HB818
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+ful+HB818+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+ful+HB818E+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+ful+HB818ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+ful+HB818ER2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+ful+CHAP0748+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+vot+H1102V0013+HB0818
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+vot+H11V0034+HB0818
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+vot+HV0313+HB0818
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+vot+S12V0120+HB0818
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+vot+SV0784HB0818+HB0818
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+vot+SV0821HB0818+HB0818
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+vot+SV0822HB0818+HB0818
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+vot+SV0823HB0818+HB0818
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+vot+HV1418+HB0818
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+vot+SV1169HB0818+HB0818
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+vot+SV1171HB0818+HB0818
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+vot+SV1172HB0818+HB0818

Bill Comments

feedback