VA HB800 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0300)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0300)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Medical assistance services; individuals confined in state correctional facilities. Directs the Department of Medical Assistance Services to coordinate with the Department of Corrections to identify persons in the custody of state correctional facilities who are currently enrolled in the Commonwealth's program of medical assistance or who may be eligible for services under the state plan for medical assistance upon release and, prior to the release of such persons, (i) review the eligibility of currently enrolled persons to ensure continued access to medical assistance upon release or (ii) enroll persons not previously enrolled who meet eligibility criteria in the Commonwealth's program of medical assistance services. Medical assistance services; individuals confined in state correctional facilities. Directs the Department of Medical Assistance Services to coordinate with the Department of Corrections to identify persons in the custody of state correctional facilities who are currently enrolled in the Commonwealth's program of medical assistance or who may be eligible for services under the state plan for medical assistance upon release and, prior to the release of such persons, (i) review the eligibility of currently enrolled persons to ensure continued access to medical assistance upon release or (ii) enroll persons not previously enrolled who meet eligibility criteria in the Commonwealth's program of medical assistance services.
Title
Medical assistance services; eligibility, individuals confined in state correctional facilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (98-Y 1-N) (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (98-Y 1-N) (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0300) | |
2022-04-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 300 (effective 7/1/22) | |
2022-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-11 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 11, 2022 |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-03-03 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-03-03 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB800ER) |
2022-03-03 | House | Enrolled |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Read third time |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Health |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2022-02-09 | House | VOTE: Passage (98-Y 1-N) |
2022-02-09 | House | Read third time and passed House (98-Y 1-N) |
2022-02-08 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB800H1 |
2022-02-08 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 22105511D-H1 |
2022-02-08 | House | Read second time |
2022-02-07 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-03 | House | Committee substitute printed 22105511D-H1 |
2022-02-03 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (21-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2022-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22100175D |