VA HB8 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 24 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-04 - Passed by indefinitely in Rules (13-Y 3-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 24 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-04 - Passed by indefinitely in Rules (13-Y 3-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
School security officers; scope of employment; School security officers; scope of employment; carrying firearm in performance of duties. Provides that each school security officer, in addition to performing each enumerated duty, is responsible for carrying out any other duty assigned to him by the local school board, excluding enforcement of discipline reserved solely and exclusively to school administrators. The bill permits a school security officer to carry a firearm in the performance of his duties if (i) within 10 years immediately prior to being hired by the local school board or private or religious school, he was an active duty member in the Armed Forces of the United States who served on active duty for at least 10 years and received an honorable discharge from such service and (ii) he has provided proof of completion of the required training course.
Title
School security officers; scope of employment, certain veterans permitted to carry.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Rules (13-Y 3-N) (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Education and Health (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (52-Y 46-N) (Y: 52 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (12-Y 10-N) (Y: 12 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Education and Health (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (52-Y 46-N) (Y: 52 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (12-Y 10-N) (Y: 12 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-04 | Senate | Passed by indefinitely in Rules (13-Y 3-N) |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Rereferred to Rules |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Rereferred from Education and Health (9-Y 6-N) |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2022-01-25 | House | VOTE: Passage (52-Y 46-N) |
2022-01-25 | House | Read third time and passed House (52-Y 46-N) |
2022-01-24 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB8H1 |
2022-01-24 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 22104669D-H1 |
2022-01-24 | House | Read second time |
2022-01-21 | House | Read first time |
2022-01-19 | House | Committee substitute printed 22104669D-H1 |
2022-01-19 | House | Reported from Education with substitute (12-Y 10-N) |
2022-01-18 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (5-Y 3-N) |
2022-01-17 | House | Assigned Education sub: K-12 |
2021-12-17 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2021-12-17 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22103404D |