VA HB798 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0807)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0807)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Income tax; apportionment of sales for debt buyers. Requires debt buyers, defined in the bill, to apportion their income from the collection of debt to Virginia based on a single sales factor starting with taxable year 2019. Generally, under current law, a taxpayer apportions its income to Virginia based on the ratio of its property, payroll, and sales in Virginia to the same factors in all other states.
Title
Income tax, state; apportionment of sales for debt buyers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 5-N) (Y: 95 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Finance (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Finance (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 5-N) (Y: 95 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Finance (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Finance (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-09 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0807) | |
2018-04-09 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 807 (effective 7/1/18) | |
2018-03-07 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018 | |
2018-03-07 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 7, 2018 |
2018-03-03 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-03-01 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-03-01 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB798ER) |
2018-03-01 | House | Enrolled |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Read third time |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2018-02-13 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 5-N) |
2018-02-13 | House | Read third time and passed House (95-Y 5-N) |
2018-02-12 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2018-02-09 | House | Read first time |
2018-02-07 | House | Reported from Finance (21-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-31 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-30 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2018-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2018-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18102177D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
58 | 1 | 408 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 416 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 422.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |