VA HB783 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-3)
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-27 - Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Workers' compensation; presumption of compensability for certain diseases. Adds cancers of the colon, brain, or testes to the list of cancers that are presumed to be an occupational disease covered by the Virginia Workers' Compensation Act when firefighters or certain employees develop the cancer. The presumption shall not apply for any individual who was diagnosed with one of the conditions before July 1, 2020. The measure removes the compensability requirement that the employee who develops cancer had contact with a toxic substance encountered in the line of duty. The bill also reduces the number of years of service needed to qualify for the presumption from 12 to five for various types of cancer. For hypertension or heart disease, the bill adds a requirement that an individual complete five years of service in their position in order to qualify.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Workers' compensation; presumption of compensability for certain diseases.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendment (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-27SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-27SenateRead third time
2020-02-26SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
2020-02-25SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations (14-Y 0-N)
2020-02-17SenateRereferred to Finance and Appropriations
2020-02-17SenateReported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
2020-02-05SenateReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2020-02-05SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2020-02-04HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N)
2020-02-04HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2020-02-03HousePrinted as engrossed 20106358D-EH1
2020-02-03HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute with amendment HB783EH1
2020-02-03HouseCommittee amendment on Appropriations agreed to
2020-02-03HouseCommittee substitute on Labor and Commerce agreed to 20106358D-H1
2020-02-03HouseRead second time
2020-01-31HouseRead first time
2020-01-29HouseReported from Appropriations with amendment (18-Y 0-N)
2020-01-28HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (5-Y 0-N)
2020-01-24HouseAssigned App. sub: Compensation & General Government
2020-01-23HouseIncorporates HB1536 (Wyatt)
2020-01-23HouseIncorporates HB733 (Reid)
2020-01-23HouseIncorporates HB121 (Carroll Foy)
2020-01-23HouseIncorporates HB44 (Brewer)
2020-01-23HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2020-01-23HouseCommittee substitute printed 20106358D-H1
2020-01-23HouseReported from Labor and Commerce with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
2020-01-21HouseSubcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
2020-01-21HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
2020-01-16HouseAssigned L & C sub: Subcommittee #1
2020-01-07HouseReferred to Committee on Labor and Commerce
2020-01-07HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101850D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
652402(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+HB783
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB783+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB783H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB783EH1+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H1401V0004+HB0783
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H14V0039+HB0783
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H0202V0006+HB0783
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H02V0028+HB0783
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV0382+HB0783
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S02V0183+HB0783
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S05V0385+HB0783
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1050HB0783+HB0783
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1156HB0783+HB0783

Bill Comments

feedback