VA HB779 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-30 - Continued to 2015 in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-30 - Continued to 2015 in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
DSS; diabetes self-care education pilot program. Requires the Department of Social Services to develop a pilot program for diabetes self-care education for individuals and families receiving public assistance, to improve clinical outcomes, health status, and quality of life for individuals with diabetes and to reduce health care costs. This bill is carried over pursuant to Rule 22 of the House.
Title
Diabetes; DSS to develop a pilot program for self-care education for individuals and families.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2015 (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-30 | House | Continued to 2015 in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote |
2014-01-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2015 (11-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-17 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2014-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2014-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14102665D |