VA HB775 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-07 - Failed to report (defeated) in General Laws and Technology (7-Y 7-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-07 - Failed to report (defeated) in General Laws and Technology (7-Y 7-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Religious freedom; applicability of certain executive orders. Provides that no rule, regulation, or order issued by the Governor or other governmental entity pursuant to the Commonwealth of Virginia Emergency Services and Disaster Law of 2000 applies to the exercise of religion in a church, synagogue, or other place of worship.
Title
Religious freedom; applicability of certain executive orders.
Sponsors
Del. Wren Williams [R] | Del. Jason Ballard [R] | Sen. Tara Durant [R] | Del. Matt Fariss [R] |
Del. Margaret Ransone [R] | Del. Phillip Scott [R] | Del. Anne Ferrell Tata [R] | Del. Thomas Wright [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Failed to report (defeated) in General Laws and Technology (7-Y 7-N) (Y: 7 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: Passage #2 (51-Y 46-N) (Y: 51 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (50-Y 48-N) (Y: 50 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (11-Y 9-N) (Y: 11 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-04 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: Passage #2 (51-Y 46-N) (Y: 51 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (50-Y 48-N) (Y: 50 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (11-Y 9-N) (Y: 11 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-04 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-07 | Senate | Failed to report (defeated) in General Laws and Technology (7-Y 7-N) |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2022-02-11 | House | VOTE: Passage #2 (51-Y 46-N) |
2022-02-11 | House | Passed House (51-Y 46-N) |
2022-02-11 | House | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by House |
2022-02-11 | House | VOTE: Passage (50-Y 48-N) |
2022-02-11 | House | Read third time and passed House (50-Y 48-N) |
2022-02-10 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2022-02-09 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-07 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice (11-Y 9-N) |
2022-02-04 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) |
2022-02-03 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #4 |
2022-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2022-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22103079D |