VA HB770 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0829)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Virginia Economic Development Partnership Authority. Clarifies (i) that the members of the Virginia Economic Development Partnership (VEDP) Authority appointed by the Governor and the Joint Rules Committee are voting members of the Authority and (ii) the authority of VEDP to direct the Attorney General to enforce contracts related to the award of economic incentives. The bill adds a member of the VEDP Authority, to be appointed by the chairman, to each of the Committee on Business Development and Marketing and the Committee on International Trade and clarifies that these committees are advisory in nature. The bill also extends to the Joint Legislative Audit and Review Commission (JLARC) the existing closed meeting exemption for discussion of portions of the VEDP strategic, marketing, and operational plans that are exempt from public disclosure. Current law requires that VEDP report on these plans to the JLARC subcommittee on economic development but does not provide an exemption for discussion of the portions of those plans not subject to public disclosure. The bill contains an emergency clause.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Virginia Economic Development Partnership Authority; members of Authority are voting members.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Governor's recommendation agreed to (38-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION EMERGENCY (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-18 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0829)
2018-04-18HouseEnacted, Chapter 829 (effective 4/18/18)
2018-04-18SenateSigned by President as reenrolled
2018-04-18HouseSigned by Speaker as reenrolled
2018-04-18HouseReenrolled bill text (HB770ER2)
2018-04-18HouseReenrolled
2018-04-18 Governor: Emergency clause added by Governor's recommendation
2018-04-18 Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted
2018-04-18SenateSenate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N)
2018-04-18SenateReconsideration of Governor's recommendation agreed to (38-Y 0-N 1-A)
2018-04-18SenateSenate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N)
2018-04-18HouseVOTE: ADOPTION EMERGENCY (98-Y 0-N)
2018-04-18HouseHouse concurred in Governor's recommendation (98-Y 0-N)
2018-04-09HouseGovernor's recommendation received by House
2018-03-20 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
2018-03-20HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 20, 2018
2018-03-12SenateSigned by President
2018-03-10HouseSigned by Speaker
2018-03-10HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB770ER)
2018-03-10HouseEnrolled
2018-03-08HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N)
2018-03-08HouseSenate substitute agreed to by House 18107640D-S1 (96-Y 0-N)
2018-03-08HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-03-08SenatePassed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
2018-03-08SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB770S1
2018-03-08SenateRead third time
2018-03-07SenatePassed by for the day
2018-03-06SenatePassed by for the day
2018-03-06SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 18107640D-S1
2018-03-06SenateReading of substitute waived
2018-03-06SenateRead third time
2018-03-05SenatePassed by for the day
2018-03-02SenatePassed by for the day
2018-03-01SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2018-02-28SenateCommittee substitute printed 18107640D-S1
2018-02-28SenateReported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
2018-02-05SenateReferred to Committee on Finance
2018-02-05SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2018-02-02HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
2018-02-02HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
2018-02-01HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB770H1
2018-02-01HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 18105665D-H1
2018-02-01HouseRead second time
2018-01-31HouseRead first time
2018-01-29HouseCommittee substitute printed 18105665D-H1
2018-01-29HouseReported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
2018-01-24HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
2018-01-19HouseAssigned App. sub: Commerce, Agriculture, Natural Resources & Technology
2018-01-09HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2018-01-09HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18103868D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
222235.1(n/a)See Bill Text
223711(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+sum+HB770
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB770+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB770H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB770S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB770ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB770ER2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+CHAP0829+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H0201V0001+HB0770
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H02V0001+HB0770
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV0251+HB0770
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+S05V0371+HB0770
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0829HB0770+HB0770
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV1091HB0770+HB0770
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV1502+HB0770
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV1647+HB0770
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV1252HB0770+HB0770
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV1259HB0770+HB0770
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV1260HB0770+HB0770

Bill Comments

feedback