VA HB77 | 2018 | Regular Session


Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0164)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]


Venue in criminal cases; concurrent jurisdiction; obsolete provisions. Provides that the courts of a locality have concurrent jurisdiction with the courts of any other adjoining locality over criminal offenses committed in or upon the premises, buildings, rooms, or offices owned or occupied by such locality or any officer, agency, or department thereof that are located in the adjoining locality and repeals an existing statute that provides such concurrent jurisdiction for certain enumerated localities. The bill also deletes references to corporation courts, which no longer exist, and repeals several obsolete provisions involving courts not of record that ceased to be applicable in 1980. This bill is a recommendation of the Virginia Code Commission.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.


Venue in criminal cases; concurrent jurisdiction, obsolete provisions.


Roll Calls

2018-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]


2018-03-05 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0164)
2018-03-05 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 164 (effective 7/1/18)
2018-02-26 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 5, 2018
2018-02-26HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 26, 2018
2018-02-23SenateSigned by President
2018-02-21HouseSigned by Speaker
2018-02-21HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB77ER)
2018-02-19SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2018-02-19SenateRead third time
2018-02-16SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
2018-02-14SenateReported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N)
2018-02-12SenateReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2018-02-12SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2018-02-09HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
2018-02-09HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2018-02-08HouseRead second time and engrossed
2018-02-07HouseRead first time
2018-02-05HouseReported from Courts of Justice (18-Y 0-N)
2018-01-29HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
2018-01-16HouseAssigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #3
2017-12-06HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2017-12-06HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18100079D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
16169.13(n/a)See Bill Text
16169.31(n/a)See Bill Text
16169.46(n/a)See Bill Text
16169.8(n/a)See Bill Text
16170(n/a)See Bill Text
16175(n/a)See Bill Text
171515.1(n/a)See Bill Text
171515.2(n/a)See Bill Text
192244(n/a)See Bill Text
19245(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

Bill Comments