VA HB767 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0778)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Election precincts not to be changed between certain dates. Prohibits counties, cities, and towns from creating, dividing, abolishing, or consolidating any precincts or otherwise changing the boundaries of any precinct between February 1, 2019, and May 15, 2021, except in certain specified circumstances. Precinct ordinances may be adopted after January 1, 2021, but may not be implemented before May 15, 2021. This bill is identical to SB 983.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Elections; precincts not to be changed between certain dates.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-10 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-10 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (33-Y 6-N) (Y: 33 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (41-Y 58-N) (Y: 41 N: 58 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE 2 (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-26 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-04 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0778)
2018-04-04 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 778 (effective 7/1/18)
2018-03-26 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
2018-03-26HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 26, 2018
2018-03-22SenateSigned by President
2018-03-20HouseSigned by Speaker
2018-03-20HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB767ER)
2018-03-20HouseEnrolled
2018-03-10HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
2018-03-10HouseConference report agreed to by House (99-Y 0-N)
2018-03-10SenateConference report agreed to by Senate (33-Y 6-N)
2018-03-10 Conference: Amended by conference committee
2018-03-05SenateSenators: Cosgrove, Reeves, Ebbin
2018-03-05SenateConferees appointed by Senate
2018-03-02HouseDelegates: Jones, S.C., Cole, Sickles
2018-03-02HouseConferees appointed by House
2018-03-02HouseHouse acceded to request
2018-03-01SenateSenate requested conference committee
2018-03-01SenateSenate insisted on substitute (39-Y 0-N)
2018-02-27HouseVOTE: REJECTED (41-Y 58-N)
2018-02-27HouseSenate substitute rejected by House 18107264D-S1 (41-Y 58-N)
2018-02-27HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-02-23SenatePassed Senate with substitute (38-Y 0-N)
2018-02-23SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB767S1
2018-02-23SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 18107264D-S1
2018-02-23SenateReading of substitute waived
2018-02-23SenateRead third time
2018-02-22SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2018-02-20SenateCommittee substitute printed 18107264D-S1
2018-02-20SenateReported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
2018-02-02SenateReferred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
2018-02-02SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2018-02-01HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE 2 (98-Y 0-N)
2018-02-01HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
2018-02-01HouseReconsideration of passage agreed to by House
2018-02-01HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
2018-02-01HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
2018-01-31HouseRead second time and engrossed
2018-01-30HouseRead first time
2018-01-26HouseReported from Privileges and Elections (21-Y 0-N)
2018-01-25HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N)
2018-01-22HouseAssigned P & E sub: Subcommittee #2
2018-01-09HouseReferred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
2018-01-09HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18102007D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
242309.2(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+sum+HB767
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB767+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB767S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB767ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+CHAP0778+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H1802V0008+HB0767
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H18V0004+HB0767
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV0190+HB0767
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV0208+HB0767
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+S08V0113+HB0767
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0639HB0767+HB0767
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0672HB0767+HB0767
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV1078+HB0767
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0798HB0767+HB0767
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV1199HB0767+HB0767
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV1555+HB0767

Bill Comments

feedback