VA HB764 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0661)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0661)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Assistant speech-language pathologists. Permits a person to practice as an assistant speech-language pathologist upon meeting the requirements prescribed by the Board of Audiology and Speech-Language Pathology.
Title
Speech-language pathologists, assistant; practice of duties under licensed pathologist.
Sponsors
Del. Kaye Kory [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-07 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute with amendment (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (2-Y 97-N) (Y: 2 N: 99 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Passed by for the day agreed to (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-06 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute with amendment (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (2-Y 97-N) (Y: 2 N: 99 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Passed by for the day agreed to (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-06 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-06 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0661) | |
2014-04-06 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 661 (effective 7/1/14) | |
2014-03-18 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Signed by President |
2014-03-17 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB764ER) |
2014-03-17 | House | Enrolled |
2014-03-07 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) |
2014-03-07 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (98-Y 0-N) |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2014-03-07 | House | Conference substitute printed 14105618D-H3 |
2014-03-07 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senators: Miller, Marsden, Martin |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2014-03-06 | House | Delegates: Kory, Orrock, Peace |
2014-03-06 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2014-03-06 | House | House acceded to request |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Senate requested conference committee |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Senate insisted on substitute with amendment (38-Y 0-N) |
2014-03-04 | House | VOTE: REJECTED (2-Y 97-N) |
2014-03-04 | House | Senate substitute with amendment rejected by House 14105168D-S1 (2-Y 97-N) |
2014-03-03 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute with amendment (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendment HB764S1 |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Read third time |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 1-N) |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Rereferred to Education and Health |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Motion to rerefer to committee agreed to |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Reconsideration of Passed by for the day agreed to (39-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Amendment by Senator Edwards agreed to |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 14105168D-S1 |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Read third time |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 14105168D-S1 |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Reported from Rules with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2014-02-11 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-11 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-10 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB764H2 |
2014-02-10 | House | Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions substitute agreed to 14104808D-H2 |
2014-02-10 | House | Read second time |
2014-02-08 | House | Read first time |
2014-02-06 | House | Committee substitute printed 14104808D-H2 |
2014-02-06 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-04 | House | Rereferred to Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2014-02-04 | House | Motion to rerefer to committee agreed to |
2014-02-03 | House | Passed by for the day |
2014-02-03 | House | Speaker ruled the committee substitute 14104448D-H1 out of order |
2014-02-03 | House | Read second time |
2014-01-31 | House | Read first time |
2014-01-30 | House | Committee substitute printed 14104448D-H1 |
2014-01-30 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (11-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-17 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2014-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2014-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14102139D |
Subjects
Commissions, Boards, and Institutions Generally
Professions and Occupations
Study Commissions, Committees, and Reports
Professions and Occupations
Study Commissions, Committees, and Reports