VA HB764 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0366)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0366)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Division of Risk Management; risk management plans for public liability; indemnification agreements by public institutions of higher education. Provides that no Virginia public institution of higher education shall be authorized to enter into an indemnification agreement to indemnify any person or entity against damages arising from a sponsored project conducted by such institution. The bill contains technical amendments.
Title
Higher educational institutions; indemnification agreements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Education and Health (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-02 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Education and Health (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-02 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0366) | |
2012-03-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 366 (effective 7/1/12) | |
2012-03-08 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2012-03-07 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2012-03-07 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB764ER) | |
2012-03-07 | House: Enrolled | |
2012-03-01 | Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) | |
2012-03-01 | Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) | |
2012-03-01 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-03-01 | Senate: Read third time | |
2012-02-29 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-27 | Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-16 | Senate: Rereferred to General Laws and Technology | |
2012-02-16 | Senate: Rereferred from Education and Health (13-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-09 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Education and Health | |
2012-02-09 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2012-02-08 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-08 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-07 | House: Printed as engrossed 12103548D-E | |
2012-02-07 | House: Engrossed by House as amended HB764E | |
2012-02-07 | House: Committee amendments agreed to | |
2012-02-07 | House: Read second time | |
2012-02-06 | House: Read first time | |
2012-02-02 | House: Reported from General Laws with amendments (22-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-31 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-27 | House: Assigned GL sub: #4 Professions/Occupations and Administrative Process | |
2012-01-18 | House: Referred to Committee on General Laws | |
2012-01-18 | House: Referred from Education by voice vote | |
2012-01-11 | House: Referred to Committee on Education | |
2012-01-11 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12103548D |