VA HB763 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0827)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Revenue Reserve Fund created. Creates the Revenue Reserve Fund to be used to offset shortfalls in the budget of two percent or less of general fund resources collected.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revenue Reserve Fund; created, report.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Governor's recommendation agreed to (38-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (89-Y 8-N) (Y: 89 N: 8 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-09 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 98-N) (Y: 0 N: 98 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-18 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0827)
2018-04-18HouseEnacted, Chapter 827 (effective 7/1/18)
2018-04-18SenateSigned by President as reenrolled
2018-04-18HouseSigned by Speaker as reenrolled
2018-04-18HouseReenrolled bill text (HB763ER2)
2018-04-18HouseReenrolled
2018-04-18 Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted
2018-04-18SenateSenate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N)
2018-04-18SenateReconsideration of Governor's recommendation agreed to (38-Y 0-N 1-A)
2018-04-18SenateSenate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N)
2018-04-18HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (89-Y 8-N)
2018-04-18HouseHouse concurred in Governor's recommendation (89-Y 8-N)
2018-04-09HouseGovernor's recommendation received by House
2018-03-26 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
2018-03-26HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 26, 2018
2018-03-22SenateSigned by President
2018-03-20HouseSigned by Speaker
2018-03-20HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB763ER)
2018-03-20HouseEnrolled
2018-03-09HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
2018-03-09HouseConference report agreed to by House (98-Y 0-N)
2018-03-09SenateConference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2018-03-09HouseConference substitute printed 18108171D-H2
2018-03-09 Conference: Amended by conference committee
2018-03-08SenateSenators: Hanger, Norment, Howell
2018-03-08SenateConferees appointed by Senate
2018-03-07HouseDelegates: Jones, S.C., Landes, Torian
2018-03-07HouseConferees appointed by House
2018-03-07HouseHouse acceded to request
2018-03-06SenateSenate requested conference committee
2018-03-06SenateSenate insisted on substitute (39-Y 0-N)
2018-03-05HouseVOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 98-N)
2018-03-05HouseSenate substitute rejected by House 18107703D-S1 (0-Y 98-N)
2018-03-05HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-03-01SenatePassed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
2018-03-01SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB763S1
2018-03-01SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 18107703D-S1
2018-03-01SenateReading of substitute waived
2018-03-01SenateRead third time
2018-02-28SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2018-02-27SenateCommittee substitute printed 18107703D-S1
2018-02-27SenateReported from Finance with substitute (16-Y 0-N)
2018-02-14SenateReferred to Committee on Finance
2018-02-14SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2018-02-13HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
2018-02-13HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
2018-02-12HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB763H1
2018-02-12HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 18106664D-H1
2018-02-12HouseRead second time
2018-02-10HouseRead first time
2018-02-09HouseCommittee substitute printed 18106664D-H1
2018-02-09HouseReported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
2018-02-07HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
2018-01-31HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
2018-01-19HouseAssigned App. sub: General Government & Capital Outlay
2018-01-09HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2018-01-09HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18101720D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
221514(n/a)See Bill Text
221831.1(n/a)See Bill Text
221831.4(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+sum+HB763
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB763+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB763H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB763S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB763H2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB763ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB763ER2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+CHAP0827+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H0204V0002+HB0763
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H0204V0011+HB0763
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H02V0040+HB0763
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV0674+HB0763
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+S05V0325+HB0763
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0749HB0763+HB0763
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0804HB0763+HB0763
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV1283+HB0763
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0939HB0763+HB0763
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV1174HB0763+HB0763
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV1538+HB0763
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV1645+HB0763
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV1252HB0763+HB0763
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV1259HB0763+HB0763
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV1260HB0763+HB0763

Bill Comments

feedback