VA HB763 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0338)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0338)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Recorded writings; deeds; cover sheets; indexes. Permits, but does not require, the use of a cover sheet in the presentation of instruments for recordation in jurisdictions that do not currently mandate the use of cover sheets. The bill provides for specific requirements for cover sheets used in the filing of deeds and other instruments relating to real property and provides that the cover sheets shall be developed in conjunction with the Office of the Executive Secretary of the Supreme Court. The bill changes the statutory form of deeds, deeds of trust, and credit line deeds of trust. The bill removes the requirement that a deed of trust trustee's office be located within the Commonwealth. The bill expressly permits limited liability companies, partnerships, and other entities to act as trustees of a deed of trust. Under current law, only individuals and corporations may act as deed of trust trustees. The bill substitutes the term "beneficiary" for "noteholder," thereby including other types of secured parties. The bill also defines "prior mortgage" and redefines "refinance mortgage" to clarify the priority of mortgages. The bill contains a partial delayed effective date as to provisions governing cover sheets in Title 17.1.
Title
Recordation of deeds and deeds of trust; use of cover sheets on deeds.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-28 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-27 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0338) | |
2014-03-27 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 338 (effective - see bill) | |
2014-03-08 | Senate | Signed by President |
2014-03-05 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2014-03-05 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB763ER) |
2014-03-05 | House | Enrolled |
2014-02-28 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-28 | House | Senate substitute agreed to by House 14105096D-S1 (98-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB763S1 |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 14105096D-S1 |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Read third time |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 14105096D-S1 |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2014-02-11 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-11 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-10 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB763H1 |
2014-02-10 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 14104390D-H1 |
2014-02-10 | House | Read second time |
2014-02-08 | House | Read first time |
2014-02-07 | House | Committee substitute printed 14104390D-H1 |
2014-02-07 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-03 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (10-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-10 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Civil |
2014-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2014-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14101983D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
17 | 1 | 223 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
17 | 1 | 227 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
17 | 1 | 227.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
17 | 1 | 249 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
17 | 1 | 252 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 811 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |