VA HB760 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-27 - Stricken from docket by Education by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-27 - Stricken from docket by Education by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Driver education programs. Expands the driver education program in Planning District Eight that deals with juvenile driver behavior, juvenile driving restrictions pursuant to the Code of Virginia, and the dangers of driving while intoxicated and underage consumption of alcohol to cover the whole Commonwealth, beginning with the 2015-2016 academic year.
Title
Driver education programs; expands program in Planning District 8.
Sponsors
Del. Thomas Rust [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-27 | House | Stricken from docket by Education by voice vote |
2014-01-22 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-10 | House | Assigned Education sub: Elementary and Secondary Education |
2014-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2014-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14103132D |