VA HB76 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-0)
Status: Introduced on December 6 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-02-09 - Continued to 2019 in Privileges and Elections by voice vote
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Political campaign advertisements; disclosure requirements; advertisements placed or promoted for a fee on an online platform. Subjects any message that is placed or promoted for a fee on an online platform to the same disclosure requirements to which print media, television, and radio advertisements are subject. The bill defines "online platform" as any public-facing website, web application, or digital application, including a social network, ad network, or search engine, that sells advertisements and has at least 50 million unique monthly United States visitors or users for a majority of months during the preceding 12 months. The bill expands the definition of "print media" to include any non-video or non-audio message placed or promoted for a fee on an online platform, subjects advertisements in video format that are placed or promoted for a fee on an online platform to the same disclosure requirements to which television advertisements are subject, and subjects advertisements in audio format that are placed or promoted for a fee on an online platform to the same disclosure requirements to which radio advertisements are subject.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Political campaign advertisements; disclosure requirements, advertisements placed, etc.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-09HouseContinued to 2019 in Privileges and Elections by voice vote
2018-02-01HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (6-Y 0-N)
2018-01-22HouseAssigned P & E sub: Subcommittee #2
2017-12-06HouseReferred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
2017-12-06HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18100684D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
242955(n/a)See Bill Text
242955.1(n/a)See Bill Text
242957(n/a)See Bill Text
242958(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback