VA HB76 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-12 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Provisional voting; attendance at meetings of the electoral board to determine the validity of provisional ballots. Permits the representative or legal counsel of a person whose provisional vote is being considered to attend the meeting of the electoral board to determine the validity of that provisional vote, without requiring the person whose provisional vote is being considered to be in attendance.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provisional voting; meetings of electoral board to determine validity of provisional ballots.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-02-12HouseLeft in Privileges and Elections
2014-01-23HouseSubcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely by voice vote
2014-01-10HouseAssigned P & E sub: Elections Subcommittee
2013-12-09HouseReferred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
2013-12-09HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14101079D

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
242653(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback