VA HB76 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0687)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0687)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Teachers without continuing contract status. Shifts the date of effective contract renewal for those teachers without continuing contract status from April 15 to June 15.
Title
Teachers; date changes for contract renewal for those without continuing contract status.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (32-Y 8-N) (Y: 32 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (87-Y 9-N) (Y: 89 N: 9 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-08 - House - House: Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (87-Y 9-N) (Y: 89 N: 9 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-08 - House - House: Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-09 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0687) | |
2012-04-09 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 687 (effective 7/1/12) | |
2012-03-05 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2012-03-02 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2012-03-02 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB76ER) | |
2012-03-02 | House: Enrolled | |
2012-02-27 | Senate: Passed Senate (32-Y 8-N) | |
2012-02-27 | Senate: Read third time | |
2012-02-24 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-23 | Senate: Passed by for the day | |
2012-02-23 | Senate: Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 1-N) | |
2012-02-14 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Education and Health | |
2012-02-14 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2012-02-13 | House: VOTE: PASSAGE (87-Y 9-N) | |
2012-02-13 | House: Read third time and passed House (87-Y 9-N) | |
2012-02-10 | House: Read second time and engrossed | |
2012-02-09 | House: Read first time | |
2012-02-08 | House: Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-02 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-18 | House: Assigned Education sub: Teachers and Admin. Action | |
2011-12-21 | House: Referred to Committee on Education | |
2011-12-21 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12101393D |
Same As/Similar To
SB278 (Same As) 2012-03-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0106)