VA HB755 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1213)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Real property taxes; blighted and derelict properties in certain localities. Provides that, in certain localities, blighted properties and derelict structures shall constitute a separate class of property for local taxation of real property. Such certain localities may, by ordinance, levy a tax on blighted properties and derelict structures at a rate that exceeds the general real property tax rate by five and 10 percent, respectively. Any tax levied pursuant to such an ordinance shall be imposed upon a determination by the real estate assessor that a property constitutes a blighted property or derelict structure. The bill also provides that, in such certain localities, delinquent tax lands may be sold six months after the locality has incurred abatement costs for buildings that have been condemned, constitute a nuisance, are a derelict building, or are declared to be blighted. The bill contains technical amendments.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Real property taxes; definitions, blighted and derelict properties in certain localities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-04-22 - House - House: VOTE: (54-Y 39-N 1-A) (Y: 54 N: 38 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (23-Y 17-N) (Y: 22 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (59-Y 39-N) (Y: 59 N: 38 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (23-Y 15-N) (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendments (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (57-Y 40-N) (Y: 57 N: 39 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (14-Y 8-N) (Y: 14 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (14-Y 8-N) (Y: 14 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (14-Y 8-N) (Y: 14 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 4-N) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-22 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1213)
2020-04-22HouseEnacted, Chapter 1213 (effective 7/1/20)
2020-04-22SenateSigned by President as reenrolled
2020-04-22HouseSigned by Speaker as reenrolled
2020-04-22HouseReenrolled bill text (HB755ER2)
2020-04-22HouseReenrolled
2020-04-22 Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted
2020-04-22SenateSenate concurred in Governor's recommendation (23-Y 17-N)
2020-04-22HouseVOTE: (54-Y 39-N 1-A)
2020-04-22HouseHouse concurred in Governor's recommendation (54-Y 39-N 1-A)
2020-04-22HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-04-08HouseGovernor's recommendation received by House
2020-03-12 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
2020-03-12HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020
2020-03-03SenateSigned by President
2020-03-02HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-03-02HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB755ER)
2020-03-02HouseEnrolled
2020-02-25HouseVOTE: Adoption (59-Y 39-N)
2020-02-25HouseSenate amendments agreed to by House (59-Y 39-N)
2020-02-25HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-21SenatePassed Senate with amendments (23-Y 15-N)
2020-02-21SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended
2020-02-21SenateCommittee amendments agreed to
2020-02-21SenateReading of amendments waived
2020-02-21SenateRead third time
2020-02-20SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-19SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations with amendments (14-Y 0-N)
2020-02-11SenateReferred to Committee on Finance and Appropriations
2020-02-11SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2020-02-10HouseVOTE: Passage (57-Y 40-N)
2020-02-10HouseRead third time and passed House (57-Y 40-N)
2020-02-07HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB755H1
2020-02-07HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 20107647D-H1
2020-02-07HouseRead second time
2020-02-06HouseRead first time
2020-02-05HouseReported from Finance with substitute (14-Y 8-N)
2020-02-05HouseCommittee substitute printed 20107647D-H1
2020-01-27HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 4-N)
2020-01-16HouseAssigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #2
2020-01-07HouseReferred to Committee on Finance
2020-01-07HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20104061D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5813221.6(n/a)See Bill Text
5813965(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+HB755&201+sum+HB755
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB755+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB755H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB755ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB755ER2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+CHAP1213+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H1002V0017+HB0755
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H10V0061+HB0755
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H10V0163+HB0755
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H10V0212+HB0755
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV0723+HB0755
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S05V0370+HB0755
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0771HB0755+HB0755
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0807HB0755+HB0755
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV1335+HB0755
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV2019HB0755+HB0755
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV2165+HB0755

Bill Comments

feedback