VA HB746 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on April 17 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Enacted, Chapter 818 (effective 7/1/24)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on April 17 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Enacted, Chapter 818 (effective 7/1/24)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Energy efficiency programs; incremental annual savings. Provides that for the 2029 program year and all subsequent years, "in the public interest" for the purpose of assessing energy efficiency programs means that the State Corporation Commission determines that the program is cost-effective. The bill directs the Commission to promulgate regulations no later than September 30, 2025, establishing a single, consistent cost-effectiveness test for use in evaluating proposed energy efficiency programs. The bill requires Dominion Energy Virginia and Appalachian Power Company to track, quantify, and report to the Commission the incremental annual savings, as defined in the bill, achieved by such utility's energy efficiency programs.
Title
Energy efficiency programs; definitions, incremental annual savings.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (95-Y 5-N) (Y: 95 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (90-Y 8-N) (Y: 90 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute with amendment (21-Y 18-N) (Y: 21 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (90-Y 7-N) (Y: 90 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce with substitute (19-Y 3-N) (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 2-N) (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (95-Y 5-N) (Y: 95 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (90-Y 8-N) (Y: 90 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute with amendment (21-Y 18-N) (Y: 21 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (90-Y 7-N) (Y: 90 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce with substitute (19-Y 3-N) (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 2-N) (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-17 | House | Enacted, Chapter 818 (effective 7/1/24) |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Signed by President as reenrolled |
2024-04-17 | House | Signed by Speaker as reenrolled |
2024-04-17 | House | Reenrolled bill text (HB746ER2) |
2024-04-17 | House | Reenrolled |
2024-04-17 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 1-N) |
2024-04-17 | House | VOTE: Adoption (95-Y 5-N) |
2024-04-17 | House | House concurred in Governor's recommendation (95-Y 5-N) |
2024-04-08 | House | Governor's recommendation received by House |
2024-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 8, 2024 | |
2024-03-11 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 11, 2024 |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Signed by President |
2024-03-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2024-03-07 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB746ER) |
2024-03-07 | House | Enrolled |
2024-03-04 | House | VOTE: Adoption (90-Y 8-N) |
2024-03-04 | House | Senate substitute with amendment agreed to by House 24107976D-S1 (90-Y 8-N) |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute with amendment (21-Y 18-N) |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendment HB746S1 |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Amendment by Senator Deeds agreed to |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 24107976D-S1 |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Read third time |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 24107976D-S1 |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (9-Y 6-N) |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2024-02-13 | House | VOTE: Passage (90-Y 7-N) |
2024-02-13 | House | Read third time and passed House (90-Y 7-N) |
2024-02-12 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB746H1 |
2024-02-12 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 24106758D-H1 |
2024-02-12 | House | Read second time |
2024-02-11 | House | Read first time |
2024-02-08 | House | Committee substitute printed 24106758D-H1 |
2024-02-08 | House | Reported from Labor and Commerce with substitute (19-Y 3-N) |
2024-02-06 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 2-N) |
2024-01-16 | House | Assigned L & C sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2024-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor and Commerce |
2024-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24101834D |
Same As/Similar To
SB565 (Similar To) 2024-04-17 - Enacted, Chapter 794 (effective 7/1/24)