VA HB74 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on December 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Elections; early voting. Allows any registered voter to vote early in any election in which he is qualified to vote without providing a reason or making prior application for an absentee ballot. The bill requires that early voting be available beginning the twenty-first day prior to any general election, the seventh day prior to any special election held on a date other than the date of a general election, and the seventh day prior to any primary election and ending at 5:00 p.m. on the Saturday immediately preceding the election. The bill further requires early voting to be available during regular business hours each weekday during the applicable period, from 9:00 a.m. to 5:00 p.m. on each Saturday during the applicable period, and from 12:00 p.m. to 4:00 p.m. on each Sunday during the applicable period. The bill removes the current provisions for voting absentee in person but retains those provisions for voting an absentee ballot by mail, including the application requirement and the list of statutory reasons that allow a registered voter to vote absentee by mail.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Early voting; any registered voter allowed to vote early in any election in which he is qualified.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-13HouseLeft in Privileges and Elections
2018-01-30HouseSubcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (4-Y 2-N)
2018-01-22HouseAssigned P & E sub: Subcommittee #1
2017-12-05HouseReferred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
2017-12-05HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18101187D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
242612(n/a)See Bill Text
242700(n/a)See Bill Text
242700.1(n/a)See Bill Text
242701(n/a)See Bill Text
242707(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback