VA HB736 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-3)
Status: Passed on April 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0730)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-3)
Status: Passed on April 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0730)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Law; compensation for veterans' benefits matters; work group; report. Directs the Department of Law's Division of Consumer Counsel to convene a work group to examine and make recommendations regarding the practice of persons receiving compensation for preparing, presenting, prosecuting, advising, consulting, or assisting any individual regarding any veterans' benefits matter, as defined in the bill. Department of Law; compensation for veterans' benefits matters; work group; report. Directs the Department of Law's Division of Consumer Counsel to convene a work group to examine and make recommendations regarding the practice of persons receiving compensation for preparing, presenting, prosecuting, advising, consulting, or assisting any individual regarding any veterans' benefits matter, as defined in the bill.
Title
Veterans; examining practice of persons receiving compensation for providing certain services, etc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-08 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (94-Y 1-N) (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 99-N) (Y: 0 N: 99 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2024-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from General Laws and Technology (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (85-Y 13-N) (Y: 85 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce with substitute (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 99-N) (Y: 0 N: 99 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2024-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from General Laws and Technology (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (85-Y 13-N) (Y: 85 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce with substitute (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-08 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0730) | |
2024-04-08 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 730 (effective 7/1/24) | |
2024-03-27 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 8, 2024 | |
2024-03-27 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 27, 2024 |
2024-03-26 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Signed by President |
2024-03-25 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB736ER) |
2024-03-25 | House | Enrolled |
2024-03-08 | House | VOTE: Adoption (94-Y 1-N) |
2024-03-08 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (94-Y 1-N)) |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-03-08 | House | Conference substitute printed 24109023D-H2 |
2024-03-08 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2024-03-07 | House | Delegates: Sewell, Glass, Ballard |
2024-03-07 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Senators: Ebbin, Subramanyam, Reeves |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2024-03-07 | House | House acceded to request |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Senate requested conference committee |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-03-07 | House | VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 99-N) |
2024-03-07 | House | Senate substitute rejected by House 24108829D-S1 (0-Y 99-N) |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB736S1 |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 24108829D-S1 |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Read third time |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 24108829D-S1 |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (11-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Rereferred to Commerce and Labor |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Rereferred from General Laws and Technology (12-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2024-02-05 | House | VOTE: Passage (85-Y 13-N) |
2024-02-05 | House | Read third time and passed House (85-Y 13-N) |
2024-02-02 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB736H1 |
2024-02-02 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 24106152D-H1 |
2024-02-02 | House | Read second time |
2024-02-01 | House | Read first time |
2024-01-30 | House | Committee substitute printed 24106152D-H1 |
2024-01-30 | House | Reported from Labor and Commerce with substitute (21-Y 1-N) |
2024-01-25 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-16 | House | Assigned L & C sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2024-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor and Commerce |
2024-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24104975D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
59 | 1 | 200 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 1 | 603 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 1 | 604 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 1 | 605 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |