VA HB736 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB736
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-04 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-04 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Estate tax; reinstatement. Reinstates the estate tax for persons dying on and after July 1, 2020. No estate tax shall be imposed on a gross estate if the majority of the assets of the estate are an interest in a closely held business or a working farm. The bill designates revenues from the estate tax to be used for health care purposes.
Title
Estate tax; reinstatement.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-04 | House | Left in Finance |
2020-01-29 | House | Continued to 2021 in Finance by voice vote |
2020-01-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2021 by voice vote |
2020-01-23 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2020-01-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2020-01-06 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20104337D |
Same As/Similar To
HB736 (Carry Over) 2020-01-29 - Continued to 2021 in Finance by voice vote
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
58 | 1 | 901 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 902 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 905 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 912 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |