VA HB733 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-06 - Stricken from docket by General Laws (20-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-06 - Stricken from docket by General Laws (20-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Residential Landlord and Tenant Act; units occupied by elderly tenants; rent stabilization allowance. Allows any locality to adopt rent stabilization provisions to prohibit any landlord, defined in the bill, from increasing the rent on any unit in which an elderly tenant, defined in the bill, resides by an amount that exceeds such locality's rent stabilization allowance. The bill defines "rent stabilization allowance" as the percentage increase in the Consumer Price Index, for the region in which the locality sits, from March in the preceding year to March in the current year, plus two percent. Finally, the bill requires any rent stabilization ordinance to include a procedure by which a landlord may apply for an exemption if the net operating income generated by the rental dwelling unit has not been maintained due to escalating operating expenses or for other appropriate reasons as established by the locality.
Title
Virginia Residential Landlord and Tenant Act; units occupied by elderly tenants.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-06 - House - House: Stricken from docket by General Laws (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-06 | House | Stricken from docket by General Laws (20-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (8-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-26 | House | Assigned GL sub: Housing/Consumer Protection |
2024-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2024-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24100914D |
Subjects
Counties Cities and Towns
Property and Conveyances
Senior Citizens
Virginia Residential Landlord and Tenant Act
Property and Conveyances
Senior Citizens
Virginia Residential Landlord and Tenant Act
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 2 | 959.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
55 | 1 | 1204.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |