VA HB73 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-19 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0340)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Maximum speed limits on certain highways. Increases from 55 miles per hour to 60 miles per hour the maximum speed limit on U.S. Route 301, the entirety of U.S. Route 17, and State Routes 3 and 207. This bill is identical to SB 466.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Speed limits; maximum speed on certain highways.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (37-Y 1-N) (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Transportation (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-19 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0340)
2018-03-19 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 340 (effective 7/1/18)
2018-03-05 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
2018-03-05HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 5, 2018
2018-03-02SenateSigned by President
2018-02-27HouseSigned by Speaker
2018-02-27HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB73ER)
2018-02-27HouseEnrolled
2018-02-23SenatePassed Senate (37-Y 1-N)
2018-02-23SenateRead third time
2018-02-22SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2018-02-21SenateReported from Finance (16-Y 0-N)
2018-02-14SenateRereferred to Finance
2018-02-14SenateRereferred from Transportation (11-Y 0-N)
2018-02-06SenateReferred to Committee on Transportation
2018-02-06SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2018-02-05HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
2018-02-05HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
2018-02-02HouseRead second time and engrossed
2018-02-01HouseRead first time
2018-01-30HouseReported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N)
2018-01-24HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
2018-01-17HouseAssigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #3
2017-12-04HouseReferred to Committee on Transportation
2017-12-04HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18102016D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
462870(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+sum+HB73
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB73+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB73ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+CHAP0340+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H1903V0004+HB0073
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H19V0021+HB0073
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV0306+HB0073
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+S11V0090+HB0073
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+S05V0294+HB0073
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0639HB0073+HB0073
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0675HB0073+HB0073

Bill Comments

feedback