VA HB73 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-16 - Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-16 - Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Driving while texting; fines. Increases the fines for texting while driving from $125 to $250 for a first offense and from $250 to $500 for a second or subsequent offense.
Title
Driving while texting; fines.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-16 | House | Left in Transportation |
2016-02-08 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2016-01-29 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2016-01-15 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2016-01-15 | House | Referred from Militia, Police and Public Safety by voice vote |
2015-12-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety |
2015-12-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16100461D |
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+sum+HB73 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+ful+HB73+hil |