VA HB728 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-17 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0546)
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-17 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0546)
Summary
Uniform group health insurance application form. Directs the State Corporation Commission's Bureau of Insurance, with the assistance of a work group comprised of representatives of health insurers, insurance agent organizations, employer organizations, and the Virginia Association of Health Plans, to develop a uniform group health insurance application form. The development of the uniform form is to be completed by July 1, 2009. Upon completion of the form, the Bureau shall provide copies to insurers, along with instructions for its use.
Title
Health insurance; State Corporation Commission to develop uniform group application form.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-03-17 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0546) | |
2008-03-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 546 (effective 7/1/08) | |
2008-03-06 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2008-03-05 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2008-03-05 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB728ER) | |
2008-03-05 | House: Enrolled | |
2008-03-03 | House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-03 | House: Senate amendment agreed to by House (100-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-29 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2008-02-28 | Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-28 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate as amended | |
2008-02-28 | Senate: Committee amendment agreed to | |
2008-02-28 | Senate: Reading of amendment waived | |
2008-02-28 | Senate: Read third time | |
2008-02-27 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-25 | Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendment (15-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-24 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor | |
2008-01-24 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2008-01-24 | House: Communicated to Senate | |
2008-01-23 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-23 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-22 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB728H1 | |
2008-01-22 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 080132716-H1 | |
2008-01-22 | House: Read second time | |
2008-01-21 | House: Read first time | |
2008-01-18 | House: Committee substitute printed 080132716-H1 | |
2008-01-17 | House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (21-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-08 | House: Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor | |
2008-01-08 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 080064716 |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+HB728 |