VA HB727 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0225)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0225)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Northern Virginia Transportation Authority; decision-making procedure. Requires the Northern Virginia Transportation Authority to make certain information concerning projects in its regional transportation plan publicly available at least 15 days prior to any decision for the expenditure of funds to create or improve a transportation facility.
Title
Northern Virginia Transportation Authority; decision-making procedure.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with amendment (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-29 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-26 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with amendment (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with amendment (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-29 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-26 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with amendment (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-04 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0225) | |
2016-03-04 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 225 (effective 7/1/16) | |
2016-02-29 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 7, 2016 | |
2016-02-29 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/29/16 |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Signed by President |
2016-02-25 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2016-02-25 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB727ER) |
2016-02-25 | House | Enrolled |
2016-02-24 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-24 | House | Senate amendment agreed to by House (98-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-23 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Read third time |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Reported from Transportation with amendment (13-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2016-01-29 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-29 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-28 | House | Printed as engrossed 16102294D-E |
2016-01-28 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB727E |
2016-01-28 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2016-01-28 | House | Read second time |
2016-01-27 | House | Read first time |
2016-01-26 | House | Reported from Transportation with amendment (21-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-21 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-15 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2016-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2016-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16102294D |