VA HB718 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0192)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0192)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Foster care; plan to reduce. Requires the Governor and the Department of Social Services, together with other appropriate executive branch agencies, to develop a plan to increase permanent placements of children with families to reduce the number of children in foster care by 25 percent by 2020.
Title
Children; Governor and DSS to develop and implement plan to reduce number in foster care.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (91-Y 6-N) (Y: 93 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (91-Y 6-N) (Y: 93 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-07 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0192) | |
2010-04-07 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 192 (effective 7/1/10) | |
2010-03-12 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2010-03-10 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2010-03-10 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB718ER) | |
2010-03-10 | House: Enrolled | |
2010-03-02 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-02 | Senate: Read third time | |
2010-03-01 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-26 | Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-03 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services | |
2010-02-03 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2010-02-02 | House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (91-Y 6-N) | |
2010-02-02 | House: Read third time and passed House (91-Y 6-N) | |
2010-02-01 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB718H1 | |
2010-02-01 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 10104546D-H1 | |
2010-02-01 | House: Read second time | |
2010-01-29 | House: Read first time | |
2010-01-28 | House: Committee substitute printed 10104546D-H1 | |
2010-01-28 | House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-26 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-20 | House: Assigned HWI sub: #2 | |
2010-01-12 | House: Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions | |
2010-01-12 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10100572D |