VA HB716 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-16 - Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-16 - Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Commonwealth Transportation Board; project evaluation. Requires the congestion mitigation factor to be given a weight twice that of all other factors combined by the Commonwealth Transportation Board when evaluating projects in the Northern Virginia highway construction district using the statewide prioritization process.
Title
Commonwealth Transportation Board; project evaluation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-16 | House | Left in Transportation |
2016-01-21 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2016-01-15 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2016-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2016-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16103832D |
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+sum+HB716 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+ful+HB716+hil |