VA HB71 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-19 - House: Stricken from docket by Transportation by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-19 - House: Stricken from docket by Transportation by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Integrated Directional Sign Program. Adds the term "retail" to the Integrated Directional Sign Program, commonly referred to as the "logo sign" program.
Title
Integrated Directional Sign Program; adds term retail.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-19 | House: Stricken from docket by Transportation by voice vote | |
2012-01-16 | House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket by voice vote | |
2012-01-13 | House: Assigned Transportation sub: #1 | |
2011-12-21 | House: Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2011-12-21 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12100742D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?121+sum+HB71 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?121+ful+HB71+hil |