VA HB708 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0402)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0402)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Rear-facing child restraint devices. Prohibits child restraint devices from being forward-facing until, at least, the child reaches two years of age or until the child reaches the minimum weight limit for a forward-facing child restraint device as prescribed by the manufacturer of the device. The bill expands the reasons that a physician may determine that it is impractical for a child to use a child restraint system to include the child's height. The bill has a delayed effective date of July 1, 2019.
Title
Forward-facing child restraint devices; requirement for transporting children.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-06 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (77-Y 20-N) (Y: 77 N: 20 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute with amendment (23-Y 17-N) (Y: 23 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Amendment by Senator McClellan agreed to (25-Y 15-N) (Y: 25 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (9-Y 4-N) (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (10-Y 3-N) (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (77-Y 23-N) (Y: 77 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (20-Y 1-N) (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 3-N) (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute with amendment (23-Y 17-N) (Y: 23 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Amendment by Senator McClellan agreed to (25-Y 15-N) (Y: 25 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (9-Y 4-N) (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (10-Y 3-N) (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (77-Y 23-N) (Y: 77 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (20-Y 1-N) (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 3-N) (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0402) | |
2018-03-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 402 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2018-03-16 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018 | |
2018-03-16 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 16, 2018 |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-03-08 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-03-08 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB708ER) |
2018-03-08 | House | Enrolled |
2018-03-06 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (77-Y 20-N) |
2018-03-06 | House | Senate substitute agreed to by House 18107817D-S2 (77-Y 20-N) |
2018-03-06 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute with amendment (23-Y 17-N) |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - floor substitute with amendment HB708S2 |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Amendment by Senator McClellan agreed to (25-Y 15-N) |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Read third time |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Substitute by Senator Cosgrove withdrawn 18107904D-S3 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Floor substitute printed 18107904D-S3 (Cosgrove) |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Substitute #2 by Senator Dunnavant agreed to 18107817D-S2 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Floor substitute printed 18107817D-S2 (Dunnavant) |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Substitute #1 by Senator Dunnavant rejected 18107620D-S1 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Floor substitute printed 18107620D-S1 (Dunnavant) |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Read third time |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Reported from Transportation (9-Y 4-N) |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2018-02-13 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (77-Y 23-N) |
2018-02-13 | House | Read third time and passed House (77-Y 23-N) |
2018-02-12 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB708H1 |
2018-02-12 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 18104941D-H1 |
2018-02-12 | House | Read second time |
2018-02-10 | House | Read first time |
2018-02-08 | House | Committee substitute printed 18104941D-H1 |
2018-02-08 | House | Reported from Transportation with substitute (20-Y 1-N) |
2018-02-06 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 3-N) |
2018-01-19 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2018-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2018-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18103259D |